Appointments & Retirements
-
September 5, 2020
Circuit Bench Retirement: Bright QC
His Honour Judge Andrew Bright QC retires as a Circuit Judge with effect from 5 September 2020. Background information His Honour Judge Bright QC (69) was called to the Bar (M) in 1973 and took Silk in 2000. He was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1999, a Recorder in 2000 and a Circuit Judge in […]
-
-
September 1, 2020
Senior Circuit Judge Retirement: de Haas QC
Her Honour Judge Margaret Ruth de Haas QC retires as a Senior Circuit Judge with effect from 1 September 2020. Background information Her Honour Judge de Haas QC (66) was called to the Bar (M) in 1977 and took Silk in 1998. She was appointed an Assistant Recorder in 1995, a Recorder in 1998, a […]
-
September 1, 2020
Circuit Judge Appointment: Kushner
The Queen has appointed Martine Kushner to be a Circuit Judge on the advice of the Lord Chancellor, the Right Honourable Robert Buckland QC MP and the Lord Chief Justice of England and Wales, the Right Honourable The Lord Burnett of Maldon. The Lord Chief Justice has deployed her to the South Eastern Circuit, based […]
-
August 20, 2020
Circuit Bench Retirement: Thomas
His Honour Judge Keith Garfield Thomas retired as a Circuit Judge with effect from 11 August 2020. Background information His Honour Judge Thomas (65) was called to the Bar (G) in 1977. He was appointed an Assistant Provincial Stipendiary Magistrate in 1995, an Assistant Recorder in 1996, a Recorder in 2000 and a Circuit Judge […]
-
August 8, 2020
Court of Appeal: Retirement of Lord Justice Patten
Lord Justice Patten retires as Lord Justice of Appeal with effect from 8 August 2020. Notes to editors Sir Nicholas John Patten (70) was called to the Bar (L) in 1974, took Silk in 1988 and was elected a Bencher in 1997. He was Chairman of the Chancery Bar Association from 1997 to 1999 and […]
-
August 7, 2020
Circuit Judge Appointment: Magee
The Queen has appointed Rosein Magee to be a Circuit Judge on the advice of the Lord Chancellor, the Right Honourable Robert Buckland QC MP and the Lord Chief Justice of England and Wales, the Right Honourable The Lord Burnett of Maldon. The Lord Chief Justice has deployed her to the Western Circuit, based at […]
-
August 5, 2020
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Retirement: Lachhar
District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Davinder Kaur Lachhar retired with effect from 2 July 2020. Notes to editors District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) Lachhar (65) was called to the Bar (M) in 1978. She was appointed a District Judge (Magistrates’ courts) in 1996 and a Recorder in 2009.
-
August 3, 2020
New Presiding Judges Appointed
The Lord Chief Justice, in concurrence with the Lord Chancellor, has announced the appointment of two Presiding Judges. Mrs Justice Cutts has been appointed to the Western Circuit where she will succeed Mrs Justice May. Mrs Justice Lambert has been appointed to the North Eastern where she will succeed Mr Justice Goss. The appointments are […]
-
August 1, 2020
District Bench Retirement: Conway
District Judge Helen Lois Conway retires from the District Bench with effect from 1 August 2020. Notes to editors District Judge Conway (49) was called to the Bar (L) in 1999. She was appointed a Deputy District Judge in 2005 and a District Judge in 2010.